HI SB9 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB9
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes, until June 30, 2022, boards to exclude the public from the meeting locations where board members are physically present if the board meetings are held by interactive conference technology during a state of emergency due to a contagious illness. Permits two or more members of a board to attend state of the city, state of the county, state of the State, or state of the judiciary addresses with certain restrictions. Requires meetings held by interactive conference technology to recess, rather than terminate, when audio communication cannot be maintained and may reconvene only when audio communication is reestablished.
Title
Relating To Board Members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB9 (Carry Over) 2021-01-22 - Referred to GVO, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=9&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB9_.HTM |