HI SB896 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB896
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides judges with greater discretion to adjust the amount owed or financial circumstances by a person who violates certain traffic offenses based on the person's inability to pay. Decreases the imprisonment term to contumacious nonpayment ratio. Increases the amount of credit given to a person committed for contumacious nonpayment.
Title
Relating To Financial Hardship.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB896 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
HB631 (Same As) 2021-06-25 - Act 081, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
HB631 (Same As) 2021-06-25 - Act 081, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=896&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB896_.HTM |