HI HB631 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 081, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 081, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides courts with greater discretion to adjust the payment of fees or fines for violations of certain traffic offenses based on the person's inability to pay or financial circumstances. Decreases the imprisonment term to contumacious nonpayment ratio. Increases the amount of credit given to a person committed for contumacious nonpayment. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Financial Hardship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Act 081, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183). |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Act 081, 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 76). |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 76) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, D. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 2:30PM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 2:30PM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Yamashita Co-Chairs; D. Kobayashi, Ward. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 395). |
2021-04-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 612) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-21. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1529) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1091) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 9:15AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 240). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 891) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 187), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB896 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM, JDC.