HI SB885 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates the department of agriculture to take precautionary measures to anticipate, prevent, or minimize the adverse effects of biotechnology and genetic engineering.
Title
Genetic Engineering; Precautionary Principle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on AGL deferred the measure. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 4:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=885&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB885_.HTM |