HI SB877 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "historic property" to require that fifty-year-old privately owned single family residences be considered historic properties for purposes of chapter 6E, Hawaii Revised Statutes, only if the property is listed or eligible for listing on the Hawaii register of historic places or is located in a historic district. Requires the state historic preservation division of the department of land and natural resources to conduct a survey on properties eligible for listing on the Hawaii register of historic places and to provide owners of historic property with notice of the property's likely eligibility. Requires a report to the legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. Repeals 12/31/2018. (SD2)
Title
Department of Land and Natural Resources; State Historic Preservation Division; Historic Property; Historic Property Survey; Definition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-20-15 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 230) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 679) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Gabbard, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kidani. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to HEA. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to HEA. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-11-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 2:45PM in conference room CR224. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, HEA. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB465 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.