HI SB876 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB876

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes the need for the department of Hawaiian home lands to consult with the department of land and natural resources on the effect of any proposed project upon historic property or a burial site on land within its jurisdiction. Allows the department of Hawaiian home lands the authority to assume the historic preservation review on any proposed project on historic properties or burial sites on land under its jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Historic Preservation Reviews.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to HWN/WTL, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB876 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HWN/WTL, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback