HI SB875 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB875
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LAB/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LAB/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for salaries and benefits for lifeguards for Kua Bay, Kekaha Kai State Park, on the island of Hawaii, an area under the jurisdiction of the Department of Land and Natural Resources. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation For State Lifeguards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 279) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 863) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 596) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB875 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LAB/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB509 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB509 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.