HI HB509 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB509
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that trial commence within 6 months in all criminal cases, pursuant to rule 48(b), (c), or (d) of the Hawaii rules of penal procedure, provided that any periods that delay the commencement of trial and are caused by court congestion shall be excluded from the computation of time. Excludes from the requirement certain traffic court cases and criminal cases involving abuse of a family or household member.
Title
Relating To Dismissal Of Criminal Cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB509 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB181 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC.
SB181 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=509&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB509_.HTM |