HI SB856 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB856
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to perform an operational audit of the academic and financial plans of the Department of Education. Requires the Department of Education to contract with a third-party consultant that specializes in school finance to study the adequacy of education funding in Hawaii. Appropriates funds. (SB856 HD3)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; L. Thielen, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 754). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2209) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1566) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Tuesday, 03-19-19 3:00PM in House conference room 312. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1316) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 274) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1124) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EDU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 424) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB856 (Carry Over) 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
HB781 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB781 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6