HI SB854 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB854
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a one-time amnesty program for liabilities for taxable years beginning on or transactions occurring on or after 01/01/2010 through taxable periods ending on or transactions occurring on 12/31/2020. Specifies that the amnesty period begins 01/01/2022 and completes no later than 12/31/2022.
Title
Relating To Tax Penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB854 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=854&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB854_.HTM |