HI SB849 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB849
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the minimum Hawaiian blood quantum requirement of certain successors to lessees of Hawaiian home lands from one-quarter to one thirty-second. (SB849 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4). |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1107) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-13 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 274) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 638) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 194) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB849 (Carry Over) 2017-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
HB451 (Same As) 2017-07-07 - Act 080, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
HB451 (Same As) 2017-07-07 - Act 080, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).