HI SB848 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB848
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the teacher salary special fund within the department of education. Requires that a portion of general excise tax revenues collected on new construction of commercial real estate projects be deposited into the state highway fund and the teacher salary special fund. Requires that a portion of conveyance tax revenues be deposited into the state highway fund and the teacher salary special fund.
Title
Relating To Disposition Of Tax Revenues.
Sponsors
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EDU/TRS, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB848 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to EDU/TRS, WAM.
Subjects
Conveyance Tax
DOE
GET
Road Infrastructure
State Highway Fund
Teacher Salaries
Teacher Salary Special Fund
DOE
GET
Road Infrastructure
State Highway Fund
Teacher Salaries
Teacher Salary Special Fund
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=848&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB848_.HTM |