HI SB831 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 114, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 114, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the chapter governing public charter schools to align the requirements for start-up and conversion charter schools. Defines "applicant governing board" and makes conforming amendments. Makes other housekeeping amendments. (CD1)
Title
Public Charter Schools; Charter Schools Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Act 114, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214). |
2015-06-16 | House | Act 114, on 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 28) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 28). |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, DeCoite, Kong, Ohno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Slom. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 2:05PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628). |
2015-04-21 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Kong added as Conferee. Representative Say discharged as Conferee. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Ohno, Say, Matsumoto. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Harimoto Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Riviere, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1564) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1113), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ito, Kong, Say, Tupola. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 216) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 824) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 114) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1001 (Same As) 2015-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).