HI SB826 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances effectiveness and efficiency of self-governance in condominium associations. (SB826 HD2)
Title
Condominiums; Owners Associations; Meetings; Managing Agent; Termination of Contract; Records; Accessibility
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-21 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1611) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-04-01 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1201) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro. |
2015-03-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-23-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-15. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-15. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 614) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Slom. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-27-15 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-25-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |