HI SB816 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB816
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-06 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-06 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows students to complete computer science courses as a substitute for science credits at the high school level to count towards graduation requirements. Requires a computer science course credit as a graduation requirement at the high school level beginning with the 2030-2031 school year. Appropriates funds for teacher professional development in computer science.
Title
Relating To Computer Science Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB816 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
HB503 (Same As) 2023-07-03 - Act 174, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
HB503 (Same As) 2023-07-03 - Act 174, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=816&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB816_.HTM |