HI SB791 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides taxable income exclusion for military on active duty who are serving outside the State pursuant to orders. (SD1)
Title
Income Tax Exclusion; Military
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 122) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |