HI SB780 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-28 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-28 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT to establish and operate a county-wide highway traffic advisory radio system to advise motorists of updated current traffic conditions in any county having a population of greater than 300,000. Appropriation.
Title
Traffic Advisory Radio System; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure. | |
2011-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-11 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to TIA, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=780 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB780_.HTM |