HI SB769 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for the director of transportation to conduct a feasibility study regarding: (1) The establishment of a fifth lane of travel on the ocean side of Farrington highway in Nanakuli from Kahe point to Mohihi street, to be used for contraflow during rush hour and requiring relocation of the existing railroad; and (2) All possible alternatives to establishing a fifth lane of travel. (SD1)
Title
Transportation; Farrington Highway; Feasibility Study; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 166) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRA, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1446 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to TRN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6