HI SB767 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Granting temporary relief from county housing requirements as recommended by the construction industry task force to stimulate housing construction statewide.
Title
Construction Task Force (2010); County Housing Requirements; Temporary Relief
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Recommitted to PGM/WLH. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Deferred until 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) One Day Notice 03-04-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from PGM/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 512) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/WLH deferred the measure until 02-10-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM/WLH. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |