HI SB759 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Act 104, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Act 104, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Primary Care and Rural Health to oversee and support community efforts to collaboratively address the health and wellness needs of the State's most underserved rural residents to develop plans that align with appropriate providers' goals and objectives. Requires the Office of Primary Care and Rural Health to include a one-time summary of community plans with the report that is to be submitted to the Legislature prior to the Regular Session of 2024. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Brenton Awa [R] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Senate | Act 104, 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205). |
2023-06-22 | House | Act 104, on 06/22/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205). |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 91) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 91). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino. |
2023-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 329. |
2023-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 4:00PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takenouchi Co-Chairs; Amato, Morikawa, Garcia. |
2023-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 911). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Aquino. |
2023-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 749). |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2090) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-30 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1431) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-17 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Garcia. |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-17-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 257) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 922) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 481) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Department of Health
Family Health Services Division
Office of Primary Care and Rural Health
Report
Rural Residents
Family Health Services Division
Office of Primary Care and Rural Health
Report
Rural Residents