HI SB759 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB759

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to Article II, Section 1, of the Hawaii State Constitution to allow the legislature to expand the right to vote in state and local elections to those who are fifteen years of age or older who pass a test of citizenship as prescribed by law for those less than eighteen years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing An Amendment To Article Ii, Section 1 Of The Hawaii State Constitution To Allow The Legislature To Expand The Right To Vote.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB759 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback