HI SB745 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires construction and renovation of public school facilities to meet the Collaborative for High Performance Schools standards. Requires replacement of old portable buildings with high performance classrooms. Also requires prioritization of public school facilities projects in accordance with certain criteria.
Title
Public School Facilities; Construction Standards; Green Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 2-2-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB986 (Same As) 2011-03-30 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=745&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB745_.HTM |