HI HB986 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of business, economic development, and tourism to establish and collect a surcharge for each film permit application it processes; specifies that all surcharge revenues and other revenue sources are to be deposited into the Hawaii television and film development special fund; requires that revenues from the special fund are to be used to fund the creative industries division. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Film Permits; Surcharge; Creative Industries Division
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 974) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-23-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 211). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 863) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Souki, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 350) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 02-08-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |