HI SB742 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB742
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county police department to collect certain data regarding police stops, uses of force, and arrests, and submit to the legislature annual reports. Effective 5/6/2137. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Policing.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 259) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 833) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 376) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:20PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB742 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22