HI SB742 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each county police department to collect certain data regarding police stops, uses of force, and arrests, and submit to the legislature annual reports. Effective 5/6/2137. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Policing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 259) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 833) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2021-02-18SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 376) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:20PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback