HI SB741 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 3:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 3:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases liquor tax rates. Reduces the liquor tax rate on the first 60,000 barrels produced in a small brewery or brewpub. Permits the provision of a discount through coupons or mail-in rebates for liquor purchases when made in combination with other merchandise. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB741 HD1)
Title
Liquor Tax Rate; Small Breweries and Brewpubs; Coupons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 3:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 3:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-11 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-11 3:45PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 672). | |
2011-04-21 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Riviere. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Baker, Ige, Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 460). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cullen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Ching, Fontaine, Hanohano, Johanson, Luke, Marumoto, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Pine, Takai, Thielen, Ward, Wooley voting no (14) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ching, Pine, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1458) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-11 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 42 | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Re-referred to ERB/LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to ERB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 165) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Nishihara, Slom. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 342) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM, CPN. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |