HI SB726 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB726
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires officers serving a warrant to declare the officer's office and business and wait thirty seconds before entry into a house, store, or other building, subject to certain circumstances. Requires officers serving a warrant issued by a district court to do so in an authorized uniform and wear and use a body-worn video camera. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Policing.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommitted to Conference Committee with Senators Acasio, Chang, Rhoads and San Buenaventura voting "No". |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of previous action taken on 04-27-21 in passing Final Reading. |
2021-04-27 | House | Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) LoPresti excused. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kidani, Wakai. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Fevella, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 72) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 72). |
2021-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 3:00PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 3:00PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 3:10PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 2:15PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima Chair; Todd, Ward. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Lee, Fevella. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 529). |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1721) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-04-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-06-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-22 | House | Re-referred to JHA, referral sheet 29 |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 111). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading with Senator Fevella voting "No". |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 692) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-21 9:31AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1382 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB726 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Recommitted to Conference Committee with Senators Acasio, Chang, Rhoads and San Buenaventura voting "No".
SB726 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Recommitted to Conference Committee with Senators Acasio, Chang, Rhoads and San Buenaventura voting "No".