HI SB716 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB716
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the university of Hawaii environmental center to conduct ongoing studies of the environmental impacts of sewage spills on affected coral reefs and submit an annual report to the legislature prior to the convening of each regular session. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Coral.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB522 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB716 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM.
SB716 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=716&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB716_.HTM |