HI HB522 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB522
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the university of Hawaii environmental center to conduct ongoing studies of the environmental impacts of sewage spills on affected coral reefs and submit an annual report to the legislature prior to the convening of each regular session. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Coral.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB716 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB522 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB522 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=522&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB522_.HTM |