HI SB707 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to TEC/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for operating expenses of the department of business, economic development, and tourism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Business, Economic Development And Tourism.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to TEC/EET, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EET, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback