HI SB703 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB703
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to HHH, EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to HHH, EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires two hours of annual in-service training in suicide prevention for all teachers, principals, and school counselors.
Title
Relating To Suicide Prevention Training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to HHH, EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 110). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 672) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB703 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to HHH, EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21