HI SB681 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB681
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a member of the board of trustees of the office of Hawaiian affairs from serving more than two consecutive four-year terms. Permits reelection after an absence of a full four-year term.
Title
Relating To Term Limits.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB681 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=681&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB681_.HTM |