HI SB651 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB651
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "hemp product" to exclude delta-8-tetrahydrocannabinol. Prohibits the sale of food products and hemp products that contain delta-8-tetrahydrocannabinol. Allows the sale of food products infused with cannabinoid, hemp extract, hemp derivatives, or other hemp products. Allows the sale of hemp leaves and hemp floral material. Requires the identity statement used for labeling or advertising of hemp products to clearly identify the hemp's place of origin. Effective 6/29/2023.
Title
Relating To Hemp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB651 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=651&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB651_.HTM |