HI SB651 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB651

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of "hemp product" to exclude delta-8-tetrahydrocannabinol. Prohibits the sale of food products and hemp products that contain delta-8-tetrahydrocannabinol. Allows the sale of food products infused with cannabinoid, hemp extract, hemp derivatives, or other hemp products. Allows the sale of hemp leaves and hemp floral material. Requires the identity statement used for labeling or advertising of hemp products to clearly identify the hemp's place of origin. Effective 6/29/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Hemp.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-25SenateReferred to HHS/CPN, JDC.
2023-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB651 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback