HI SB651 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act 134, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act 134, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renames Kahului Airport Access Road on Maui as the Mayor Elmer F. Cravalho Way. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Renaming Kahului Airport Access Road.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | House | Act 134, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Act 134, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 813). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-21. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-21. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-21 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 462). |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1805), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-30-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1369) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-24 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-24-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-24-21 11:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 244) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 925) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 84) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB775 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).