HI HB775 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB775
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renames Kahului Airport Access Road on Maui as the Mayor Elmer F. Cravalho Way. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Renaming Kahului Airport Access Road.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, McKelvey, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-16 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 712) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1597) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-06-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1093) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 137). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 820), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Todd. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 276), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB775 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
SB651 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Act 134, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
SB651 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Act 134, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).