HI SB645 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB645
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to ECD/HSG, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to ECD/HSG, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period in which a county may adopt a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions. Authorizes the use of county surcharge revenues for affordable and workforce housing infrastructure. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to ECD/HSG, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 242) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:30PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB645 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to ECD/HSG, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
HB1146 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
HB1146 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).