HI HB1146 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the period in which a county may adopt a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions, from 3/31/2019 to 12/31/2021. Authorizes the use of county surcharge revenues for affordable and workforce housing infrastructure. Effective 1/1/2055. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from ECD/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-12HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-02-12HouseThe committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Sayama; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Onishi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by ECD/HSG on Tuesday, 02-16-21 11:30AM in House conference room 312 & 423 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to ECD/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB645 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback