HI SB631 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (H) Act 217, on 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (H) Act 217, on 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases, with certain limitations, the areas within agricultural lands in which solar energy facilities may be constructed. (CD1)
Title
Renewable Energy; Agricultural Land; Solar Energy Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (H) Act 217, on 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321). | |
2011-07-12 | (S) Act 217, 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 9) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 9). | |
2011-04-25 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Chang, Ito, Kawakami, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tsuji. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 3:35PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Coffman, Chang, Tsuji Co-Chairs; Ito, Kawakami, Thielen. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 604). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Deferred until 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 400). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Saiki, Takumi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-08-11. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 04-01-11 9:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from EEP/WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1152) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to AGR. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Chang, Chong, Har, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLO on Monday, 03-21-11 9:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EEP/WLO, AGR, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 143) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hee, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from ENE/AGL/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 489) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Green. | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Tokuda, Wakai. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/AGL/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-11 3:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to ENE/AGL/WLH. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |