HI SB626 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Subjects the University of Hawaii Board of Regents' approval of tuition and fee differential changes to the public notice, public hearing, and gubernatorial approval requirements of the administrative procedure law in Chapter 91, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
University of Hawaii; Tuition and Fee Changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-12-13 3:30PM in conference room 414. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=626&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB626_.HTM |