HI SB622 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that the Chief Election Officer is an at-will employee. Requires Elections Commission to provide notice and reason for removal of a Chief Election Officer. Requires a performance evaluation of the Chief Election Officer after a State general election. Requires a public hearing on the Chief Election Officer's performance for purposes of considering reappointment. (SB622 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chief Election Officer; Elections Commission; Evaluation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-17 Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
2015-03-27HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
2015-03-27HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1185) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2015-03-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, McDermott, Thielen.
2015-03-17HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-20-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2015-03-12HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
2015-03-06HousePass First Reading
2015-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 23) in amended form (SD 1).
2015-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2015-02-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-15.
2015-02-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2015-02-25SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2015-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2015-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2015-01-26SenateReferred to JDL.
2015-01-26SenatePassed First Reading.
2015-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB42 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
HB1414 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback