HI SB618 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB618
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of education to establish a process whereby the public may petition the board to add items to the agenda of the next meeting. (SB618 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Board Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1304) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ohno; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey, Matsumoto. |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 20). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, K. Rhoads). Transmitted to House. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-02-17. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-13-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB618 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).