HI SB615 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB615
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the maritime industry grant program. Appropriates moneys to fund the grant program. Takes effect 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Workforce Development.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 188) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB615 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.