HI SB609 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB609
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides veterinarians who provide emergency care to an animal immunity from civil liability in the absence of gross negligence. Provides veterinarians who render emergency treatment when there is no veterinarian-client-patient relationship immunity from civil liability in the absence of gross negligence. Requires veterinarians to report events of animal injury, death, or abuse to law enforcement where there is reasonable cause to believe that it relates to dog fighting or animal abuse and gives veterinarians immunity for civil liability for making the reports.
Title
Relating To Veterinarians.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 115) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB609 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
HB1086 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Act 091, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
HB1086 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Act 091, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
Subjects
Animal Abuse
Civil Liability Immunity
Dog Fighting
Good Samaritan Protection
Report
Veterinarian-Client-Patient Relationship
Veterinarians
Civil Liability Immunity
Dog Fighting
Good Samaritan Protection
Report
Veterinarian-Client-Patient Relationship
Veterinarians