HI SB601 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB601
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits roofing contractors from offering to pay, in any monetary form, an insured's property or casualty insurance deductible as an incentive to induce the insured to hire the contractor. Allows an insured to rescind a contract with the roofing contractor if an insurer notifies the insured that all or any part of a claim or contract is not a covered loss under the insured's insurance policy and requires the roofing contractor to return funds after the rescission, in certain circumstances. Requires roofing contractors to provide certain forms to an insured, prior to entering into a contract. Prohibits roofing contractors from representing or negotiating, or offering or advertising to do so, on behalf of an insured in an insurance claim. Specifies violations are unfair methods of competition and unfair or deceptive acts or practices. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Roofing Contractors.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1408) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-18-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 105) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kim . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 106) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB601 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Property or Casualty Insurance
Right to Rescind
Roofing Contractors
Unfair Methods of Competition
Unfair or Deceptive Acts or Practices
Right to Rescind
Roofing Contractors
Unfair Methods of Competition
Unfair or Deceptive Acts or Practices