HI SB601 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB601

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits roofing contractors from offering to pay, in any monetary form, an insured's property or casualty insurance deductible as an incentive to induce the insured to hire the contractor. Allows an insured to rescind a contract with the roofing contractor if an insurer notifies the insured that all or any part of a claim or contract is not a covered loss under the insured's insurance policy and requires the roofing contractor to return funds after the rescission, in certain circumstances. Requires roofing contractors to provide certain forms to an insured, prior to entering into a contract. Prohibits roofing contractors from representing or negotiating, or offering or advertising to do so, on behalf of an insured in an insurance claim. Specifies violations are unfair methods of competition and unfair or deceptive acts or practices. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Roofing Contractors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-25HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1408) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-03-18HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-03-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-18-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21
2021-03-09HousePass First Reading
2021-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 105) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kim . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-18SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-10SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 106) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to CPN, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB601 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback