HI SB601 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB601
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to allow each gubernatorial nominee to appoint, prior to the primary election, a person from the same political party as a running mate for lieutenant governor in the primary election.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article V, Section 2, Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB601 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=601&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB601_.HTM |