HI SB599 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB599
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Criminal Justice Assessment Commission within the Department of Public Safety to recommend methods that will promote collaboration among the state and county criminal justice entities. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To The Criminal Justice System.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB599 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=599&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB599_.HTM |