HI SB596 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB596
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits holdover board members of the Hawaii Tourism Authority from holding office beyond the commencement of the next legislative session following the expiration of the member's term of office. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Tourism Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 103) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 634) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 89) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB596 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 21