HI SB596 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 10:00AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 10:00AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to increase access by medically underserved resident populations to culturally appropriate primary health care services by supporting the development of the rural health workforce for the Hilo medical center, by implementing and sustaining the rural interdisciplinary residency program. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB596 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Health Corps; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-11 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Nishimoto, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Saiki, Pine. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Tokuda, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro, Wakai. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 453). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1542), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-07-11 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from HLT/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1165) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Belatti, Hanohano, Mizuno, Takai, Takumi, Wooley, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Chang, Saiki, Ching. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ching. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HED on Tuesday, 03-22-11 11:15AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HLT/HED, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 139) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 648) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Ryan ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from HTH/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 253) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HTH/EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |